judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARVEY JOHNSON V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 10-AA-0778
Short Caption:HARVEY JOHNSON V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Lead:10-AA-0778Consolidated: 10-AA-0845
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB67-10Filed Date:06/30/2010

Opening Event Date:06/30/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/03/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/09/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorKnot Shop (the)/tie Rack Inc.& Hartford InsN
Chad A. Michael NN
PetitionerHarvey Johnson N
Eric M. May NN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/30/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
06/30/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
06/30/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. & Gregory Lamb, Esq.
07/13/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE - The Knot Shop/ Tie Rack Inc. and Hartford Insurance Compancy ****CC: on OTSC - WILL BE ADDRESSED ON FINAL ORD LW
07/19/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER. See Washington Hospital Center v. DC Dept. of Emply Srv, 712 A.2d 1018 (DC 1998). (BY: ETW)
07/26/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of THE KNOT SHOP/TIE RACK, INC. and THE HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANIES AS INTERVENORS in APPEAL NO. 10-AA-778. It is *****MORE*****
07/26/2010 FURTHER ORDERED, SS, that APPEALS NOS. 10AA778 and 10AA845 ARE HEREBY CONSOLIDATED for all purposes herein. It is *****MORE*****
07/26/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that petitioners in APPEAL NO. 10AA845 shall, W/N 20 DAYS fromthe date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why the appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER. See Washington Hosp. Center v. DC Dept of Emplyment Srv, 712 A.2d 1018 (DC 1998).(BY :ETW)
08/03/2010RECORD ON APPEAL (10-AA-778)
08/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (8/26/09 proc.)
08/03/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/09/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL both petitoners
08/18/2010 ORDERED that the JOINT MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of these appeals IS GRANTED and these appeals are hereby DISMISSED. (BY: ETW) lw
08/18/2010DISMISSED
09/09/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived