Case: 03-91-00330-CR
03-91-00330-CR
08/09/1991
Drug Possession
Paul Anthony Scales
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/05/1995 | CASE STORED | | |||
12/08/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |||
09/16/1992 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
09/02/1992 | list of additional authorities | | |||
07/27/1992 | Submitted | | |||
07/27/1992 | Submission | | |||
06/25/1992 | Brief filed | | |||
06/25/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |||
06/25/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/25/1992 | Submission | | |||
06/16/1992 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
05/21/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/15/1992 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
04/23/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
04/17/1992 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
03/23/1992 | Brief filed | | |||
02/27/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/20/1992 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
01/23/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/21/1992 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
12/27/1991 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |||
12/19/1991 | Exhibits filed | | |||
12/19/1991 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
12/05/1991 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/04/1991 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |||
11/26/1991 | Statement of facts overdue | | |||
11/21/1991 | Transcript Filed | | |||
08/09/1991 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
08/09/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/08/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Scales, Paul Anthony | Appellant | Ms. Linda Icenhauer-Ramirez |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. Robert Smith |
Trial Court Information
147th District Court
Travis
Honorable Wilford Flowers
0910921
55 yrs. (HABITUAL)