judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUN CITY VS. STATE, DEPT OF TAXATION

Case Information: 36222
Short Caption:SUN CITY VS. STATE, DEPT OF TAXATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38171
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A327534Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/09/2000 / Cohen, LarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/05/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from McDonald Carano Wilson McCune Bergin Frankovich & Hicks LLP--check no. 06351.
06/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09371
06/09/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry J. Cohen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/14/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 00-10126
06/15/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 00-10180
06/16/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt.
06/20/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter.
08/25/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is recessed for 30 days. 00-14955
09/11/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: end of September. 01-15269
12/31/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Settlement Judge will notify this court of further developments as the parties work on documenting the terms of their agreement. 01-21950
02/15/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties are finalizing their plan to resolve this matter. 02-03050
03/22/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 10, 2002. 02-05159
07/05/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 5, 2002. 02-11481
07/09/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Representation of Respondent State of Nevada Department of Taxation. 02-11702
07/15/2002Notice/Outgoing Letter. Larry J. Cohen. (Notice of Change of Representation of Respondent State of Nevada/Department of Taxation)
08/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. An additional settlement conference has been scheduled for September 5, 2002. Although we strongly support the parties' efforts to resolve this matter without the need for further litigation, we are also committed to the timely resolution of appeals before this court. The parties shall have until September 20, 2002 to either (1) resolve these matters and file a stipulation to dismiss these appeals or (2) show cause why the briefing schedules should not be reinstated. Nos. 36222/38171-case are not consolidated. 02-13861
09/09/2002MotionFiled Motion. Parties' Joint Request for Continued Suspension of Briefing Schedule. Nos. 36222 and 38171 (not consolidated). 02-15495
09/11/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 15, 2002. 02-15744
10/01/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed September 9, 2002. The parties shall have until October 31, 2002, to resolve these appeals and file a stipulation to dismiss these appeals. If the parties do not file a stipulation to dismiss these appeals by October 31, 2002, this court will reinstate the briefing of these appeals. Nos. 36222/38171-cases are not consolidated. 02-16922
11/04/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Final Settlement Conference Report. Settlement conference report requesting extension of time for final report to 11/15/02. 02-18975
11/27/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-20471
12/06/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conferences, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . these appeals and cross-appeals are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK. Nos. 36222/38171-cases are not consolidated. 02-20923
12/06/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.