judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DALE WAYNE EATON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-255)
Case Number:06-255Case Docketed On:11/01/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:DALE WAYNE EATON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DALE WAYNE EATON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDale Wayne EatonDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Other, Post-Conviction Relief
Opinion Number:2008 WY 97
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/01/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/19/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/01/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/02/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/19/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
04/30/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/01/2007Order - Consolidating cases - (for opinion only with 04-180)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
05/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
05/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina KerinNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David DelicathNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/23/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; David L. Delicath, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/14/2007Motion - Supplement the record. Appellant's motion to correct and supplement the record on appeal.MotionSupplement the recordFinal
07/10/2007Order - Granting appellant's motion to supplement the record. (Record is supplemented with the documents attached to appellant's motion and each justice had copy for conference.)OrderGrantFinal
08/05/2008Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
08/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received notice of additional authorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/18/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/02/2008Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
09/02/2008Brief - Petitioner in support of rehearingBriefPetitionerFinal
09/02/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant in support of petition for rehearing.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2008Order - Denying petition for rehearingOrderDenyFinal
09/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/15/2008Record - Record returned to district court (to be transported by Supreme Court Clerk to District Court Clerk)RecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - record receipt from district court clerkNotice-IncomingOtherFinal