judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VINCENT TRICE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0799
Short Caption:VINCENT TRICE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead: 09-CM-0177 Consolidated:10-CO-0799
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD15171-08Filed Date:06/24/2010

Opening Event Date:06/24/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/27/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/04/2010
Argued/Submitted:03/30/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/08/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVincent Trice Y
Gaillard T. HuntNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/22/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 09-CM-177 and 10-CO-799 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Gaillard Hunt, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in apepal no. 10-CO-799 herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall transmit the record index and record copies in appeal no. 10-CO-799 forthwith. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's consolidated brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: ETW)
07/27/2010RECORD INDEX (10CO799)
07/27/2010RECORD COPIES (10CO799)
07/27/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/31/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
08/31/2010APPENDIX (attached to brief)
09/27/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until November 4, 2010 (no oppo)
10/14/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before November 4, 2010. (By: JAC)
11/04/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/04/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/22/2010APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF until December 10, 2010 (no oppo)
11/24/2010FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
12/01/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's reply brief shall be filed within 10 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
12/06/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
02/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
03/30/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/30/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Oberly, Steadman
06/17/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
06/22/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
07/08/2011MANDATE ISSUED