judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL HOOKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0798
Short Caption:MICHAEL HOOKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Misd. Sex Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD13940-09Filed Date:06/24/2010

Opening Event Date:06/24/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/11/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/21/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael Hooker Y
Mindy A. DanielsNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Mindy Daniels, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/19/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Mindy Daniels, Esquire
08/11/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (163pgs/Johnson) 5/11/10 proc. w/CD included
08/11/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/12/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (ex parte defense motion under seal to reveal selected medical record information to the defendant filed 11/17/09) *****SEALED
08/12/2010RECORD INDEX
08/12/2010RECORD COPIES
08/18/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
08/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
10/15/2010 On consideration of this court's order of August 26, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
11/09/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to late file motion for summary reversal. no oppo
11/09/2010RECEIVED - motion for summary reversal.
11/10/2010error -
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (5pgs/Tape) 5/11/10 proc. w/CD ***SUPPLEMENTAL)
12/17/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND-for competency determination by the trial court (Joint)
12/20/2010ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT MOTION TO REMAND and the case is remanded to the Superior Court for further proceedings consistent with the statement made in the joining motion. It is F/O that appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged motion for summary reversal is denied as moot. It is F/O that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (ETW)
12/20/2010REMANDED
12/21/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived