judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NELSON (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36221
Short Caption:NELSON (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32618 , 33788 , 36061 , 36231
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C134554Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09366
06/05/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
07/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-12749
08/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14585
08/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14585