judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS L. and HELEN L. WILSON v. THE DISTRICT COURT, EIGHTH JUDICIAL DISTRICT and LUCERNE CANAL AND POWER COMPANY

Case Heading (S-07-0105)
Case Number:S-07-0105Case Docketed On:05/10/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Mandamus
Short Title:THOMAS L. and HELEN L. WILSON v. THE DISTRICT COURT, EIGHTH JUDICIAL DISTRICT and LUCERNE CANAL AND POWER COMPANY
Full Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., THOMAS L. WILSON and HELEN L. WILSON, Petitioners, v. THE DISTRICT COURT, EIGHTH JUDICIAL DISTRICT, GOSHEN COUNTY, WYOMING Respondent, and LUCERNE CANAL AND POWER COMPANY, Intervenor/Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
IntervenorLucerne Canal and Power CompanyHarriet M. Hageman
PetitionerThomas L. WilsonFrank J. Jones
PetitionerHelen L. WilsonFrank J. Jones
RespondentKeith KautzPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/10/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/10/2007Petition - Writ - mandamus. No service on Attorney General, left message that it had been filedPetitionWrit - mandamusFinal
05/10/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/11/2007Notice-Internal - Other See Case NotesNotice-InternalOtherFinal
05/24/2007Motion - Intervene Lucerne Canal and Power Company; and received copy brief in response and answer to petition (both not filed per CJ)MotionInterveneFinal
05/24/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Harriet Hageman to appear on behalf of proposed intervenorNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/25/2007Response/Objection - Petition for review (mandamus)Response/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
05/25/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
06/05/2007Order - Petition for review - deny. Order granting motion to intervene and Order denying petition for writ of mandamus.OrderPetition for review - denyFinal
06/05/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal