judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN SWEENEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0797
Short Caption:JOHN SWEENEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-19730-09Filed Date:06/24/2010

Opening Event Date:06/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/02/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/08/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/04/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Sweeney Y
Nancy E. AllenYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Amanda J. Winchester YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Nancy Allen, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/20/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Nancy Allen, Esquire
07/29/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
10/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (198 pgs/Burr) 1/25/10 proc.
10/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (199-522 pgs/Burr) 1/26-27/10 proc.
10/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (10 pgs/Burr) 1/29/10 proc.
10/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (12 pgs/Geddes) 2/1/10 proc.
10/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (13 pgs/Geddes) 2/2/10 proc. w/cd
11/02/2010RECORD INDEX
11/02/2010RECORD COPIES
11/02/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/10/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/09/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 90 days no oppo
12/21/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 21, 2011. (JAC)
01/24/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/24/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
02/28/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 11, 2011 (no oppo)
03/07/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 11, 2011. (JAC)
04/08/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/08/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/08/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD with attached documents (unopposed)
04/20/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
04/21/2011 On consideration of the unopposed motion of appellee to supplement the record with the lodged documents that were part of the record in the trial court, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged documents will be forwarded to the Appeals Coordinator's Office for transmittal to this court as a supplemental record. (JAC)
04/28/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (gvt's notice of filing- filed 1/24/10
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/04/2011FiledSubmitted To Washington,Glickman,Terry
10/13/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and Terry, Senior Judge.)
10/25/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
11/04/2011FiledMandate