judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUSTIN EVERETT EZRA CRAPO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-258)
Case Number:06-258Case Docketed On:11/08/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:DUSTIN EVERETT EZRA CRAPO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DUSTIN EVERETT EZRA CRAPO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDUSTIN EVERETT EZRA CRAPODiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Ryan R. Roden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Timothy Justin Forwood

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments
Opinion Number:2007 WY 194
Citation:172 P.3d 393

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/08/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/08/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/22/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/26/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/08/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/09/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/20/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/03/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/10/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/22/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/29/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential reportsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/11/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/13/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card from WardenServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/27/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/27/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/02/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal