Case: 11-04-00146-CR
11-04-00146-CR
05/24/2004
Poss With Intent to Deliver a Controlled Substance
Ruben Ortiz, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/09/2006 | Mandate issued | | |||
04/12/2006 | Case returned from higher court | | |||
03/08/2006 | Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case disposed | Refused | | ||
10/07/2005 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||
09/26/2005 | Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case | | |||
08/25/2005 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
08/25/2005 | Opinion publish sheet | | |||
02/22/2005 | Submitted | | |||
02/17/2005 | We send letter to lawyers, etc. | | |||
01/26/2005 | submission and oral argument at Hardin Simmons University, Abilene | | |||
11/10/2004 | Brief filed | | |||
11/10/2004 | Case ready to be set | | |||
10/14/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Writ or Motion Granted in Part | | ||
10/12/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |||
09/10/2004 | Brief filed | | |||
09/02/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/25/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |||
07/29/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/26/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |||
07/14/2004 | Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed | | |||
06/25/2004 | supplemental clerk record and/or reporter record | | |||
05/27/2004 | Late record inquiry | | |||
05/27/2004 | certificate of appeal requested from trial court | | |||
05/27/2004 | Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed | | |||
05/24/2004 | Record received | | |||
03/17/2004 | Notice of appeal filed | | |||
01/06/2004 | motion for new trial filed in trial court | | |||
12/19/2003 | Sentenced in trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/09/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Ortiz, Jr., Ruben | Criminal - Appellant | Michael McLeaish |
State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Ricky B. Smith Sammy M. McCrary, Assistant |
Trial Court Information
106th District Court
Dawson
Honorable Carter Schildknecht, Judge **RETIRED--DO NOT SEND**
03-6165
60 years