Case: 02-06-00169-CV
02-06-00169-CV
05/17/2006
Miscellaneous civil
Jeffrey D. Westbrook
Danny R. Horton, Robert R. Treon, James D. Mooneyham, Richard E. Warhen, Jimmy O. Bowman, Jimmy S. Webb, Deborah L. Ford, Roy W. Monroe, Gary D. West, Sharon L. McWhirter, Priscilla R. Morales, Rodney Cooper, Patsy F. Bell, David F. Fondren, et al.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/20/2007 | Correspondence from interested entity | | |||||
07/13/2007 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
05/03/2007 | Memorandum opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded |
| ||||
03/19/2007 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||||
03/19/2007 | Motion for Leave Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
03/19/2007 | Motion for Leave Filed | | |||||
03/06/2007 | Letter | | |||||
03/06/2007 | Reply Brief Received (not filed) | | |||||
02/28/2007 | Other Document Received | | |||||
01/29/2007 | Submitted | | |||||
01/03/2007 | Submission | | |||||
01/03/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
01/03/2007 | Brief Filed | | |||||
12/18/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
12/15/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||
11/17/2006 | Brief Filed | | |||||
10/23/2006 | Letter | | |||||
10/23/2006 | Brief Received, Not Filed | | |||||
10/20/2006 | Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed | | |||||
08/28/2006 | Correspondence from interested entity | | |||||
08/23/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/21/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||
08/04/2006 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||
07/31/2006 | Correspondence from interested entity | | |||||
07/21/2006 | Motion Filed | | |||||
07/18/2006 | Letter | | |||||
07/13/2006 | Motion for Rehearing Granted | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/10/2006 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
07/03/2006 | Affidavit Filed | | |||||
07/03/2006 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||||
06/28/2006 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||
06/22/2006 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||||
06/21/2006 | Submitted | | |||||
06/05/2006 | Unpaid Fee Notices | | |||||
05/22/2006 | Correspondence from interested entity | | |||||
05/17/2006 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/13/2007 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Barrow, Vickie | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Morales, Priscilla | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Monroe, Roy | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Johnson, David L. | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Mooneyham, James D. | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Johnson, Gary | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Cooper, Rodney | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Fondren, David F. | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Bell, Patsy F. | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
McWhirter, Sharon | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Patrick, John M. | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Treon, Robert R. | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Trent, Sherilyn | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Breaux, Anita R. | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Westbrook, Jeffrey D. | Appellant | Jeffrey D. Westbrook |
Cockrell, Janie | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Warhen, Richard | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Hoke, Frank | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Offield, Kelly | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Ford, Deborah | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Drethe, Doug | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Horton, Danny | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Ward, Kelli | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
West, Gary D. | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Webb, Jimmy S. | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Bowman, Jimmy O. | Appellee | Brandy Bramlett |
Trial Court Information
89th District Court
Wichita
Honorable Mark T. Price
159,565-C