judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HILL (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36219
Short Caption:HILL (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C155258Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09365
06/19/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Samuel F. Stapleton shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 00-10455
08/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 00-15008
09/12/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. STRICKEN BY ORDER 10/05/00. 00-16023
09/12/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. STRICKEN BY ORDER 10/05/00. 00-16025
09/18/2000MotionFiled Motion. Attorney S. Frank Stapleton. 00-16424
09/25/2000MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Appellant's Fast Track Statement. 00-16834
10/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 12, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a fast track statement. On September 18, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw. On September 25, 2000, the State filed a motion to strike the fast track statement. The fast track statement filed by counsel is entirely inadequate. The clerk of this court is directed to strike the fast track statement and appendix filed on September 12, 2000. Counsel must first file an adequate fast track statement. The motion to withdraw is therefore denied. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to serve and file an amended fast track statement and a joint appendix or an appellant's appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days from filing of the amended fast track statement and appendix to serve and file the fast track response. 00-17695
11/06/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Request to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement, or, in the alternative, for Appellant to File His Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal. 00-19501
11/08/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Motion to file Fast Track Statement/Motion to Voluntary Dismiss Appeal). 00-19686
11/15/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal. 00-20037
01/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[On November 6, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time in which to file the fast track statement or, in the alternative, to file a motion to dismiss this appeal voluntarily. The motion is denied as moot.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-00861
01/16/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.