judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SOMERSET PLACE MANAGEMENT GROUP V. DC DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 10-AA-0796
Short Caption:SOMERSET PLACE MANAGEMENT GROUP V. DC DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DPW2735-10Filed Date:07/06/2010

Opening Event Date:07/06/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/16/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/23/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerSomerset Place Management GroupN
Jeffrey S. Larson NN
RespondentD.C. Dep't of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/06/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
07/20/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
07/27/2010 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Somerset Place Management is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
08/09/2010APPEARANCE - of Jeffrey Larson on behalf of petitioner
08/19/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
10/13/2010PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for extension of time to file record on appeal no oppo 30 days
01/14/2011ORDER DENYING PTNR MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION It is F/O that the Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW)
09/16/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/ 1/4/11 hearing
09/16/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/23/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/01/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (titled as: line of dismissal) (Petitioner)Granted
11/29/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (titled as: line of dismissal) (Petitioner)
11/29/2011FiledDismissed
12/23/2011FiledMandate