judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD L. WAGNER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0104)
Case Number:S-07-0104Case Docketed On:05/10/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Motor Vehicles 31-1-101 through 31-18-903
Short Title:RICHARD L. WAGNER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD L. WAGNER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard L. WagnerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Bruce A. Salzburg
Eric Alan Johnson
Brian J. Hunter
Clarissa Collier

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -DUI, Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2008 WY 51
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/10/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/10/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/26/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/27/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/10/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/13/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/25/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
11/05/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
11/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - Brian J. Hunter and Clarissa Collier to appear on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
11/08/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Clarissa Collier, Student Intern for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David E. Westling for appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/30/2007Event - Phone Call - received call from district court clerk indicating that all of the record was not returned from either the AG or PD's office. She will contact them - record may be late.EventPhone CallFinal
12/06/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, six volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II - VI, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/12/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Public Defender for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Eric Johnson, Director, PAP, and Clarissa Collier, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Collier for appellant) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/12/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/02/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/21/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/21/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/23/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/22/08 by Bonnie Petsch.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal