judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-85
A-85
03/08/1944
Application for Writ of Error
BESSIE FRY
DIXIE MOTOR COACH CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/09/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/08/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/31/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/21/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/18/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
03/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/21/1944Letter Filed
05/13/1944Response to Motion filed
05/09/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/08/1944Supplemental Brief filed
04/03/1944Bond
04/03/1944Affidavit filed
03/31/1944Supplemental Brief filed
03/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
03/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
03/21/1944Reply to Response
03/18/1944Response to Petition
03/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/08/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bessie FryPetitioner
Dixie Motor Coach CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information