Case: 05-05-00513-CR
05-05-00513-CR
04/13/2005
Other Felony
Lutz, Ross Alan
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/03/2007 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/03/2007 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/10/2007 | Record Returned | | |
02/28/2007 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
09/26/2006 | Record Shipped | | |
09/05/2006 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
08/08/2006 | Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/05/2006 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
06/16/2006 | Rehearing Due | | |
06/12/2006 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
05/23/2006 | Mot-Ext to File Rehear Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/18/2006 | Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing | | |
05/02/2006 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/02/2006 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
05/02/2006 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/11/2006 | Submitted | | |
04/11/2006 | Submission | | |
04/11/2006 | Submitted | | |
02/15/2006 | Submission | | |
01/17/2006 | Brief Filed | | |
01/17/2006 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/17/2006 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/16/2006 | Brief Due | | |
12/17/2005 | Brief Due | | |
12/14/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/13/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
11/17/2005 | Case reinstated | | |
11/17/2005 | Order Entered | Vacated | |
11/17/2005 | Case reinstated | | |
11/16/2005 | Brief Filed | | |
11/16/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/15/2005 | Brief Received | | |
11/15/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
10/24/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Denied | |
10/24/2005 | Order Entered | Abated | |
10/24/2005 | Order Entered | Abated | |
10/19/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
10/16/2005 | Brief Due | | |
09/27/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/26/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
09/16/2005 | Brief Due | | |
08/17/2005 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
08/17/2005 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |
07/27/2005 | Record due | | |
07/26/2005 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
04/14/2005 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
04/13/2005 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
04/13/2005 | 25.2 Certification filed | | |
04/13/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/13/2005 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/12/2005 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
03/29/2005 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |
03/29/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/03/2007 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | William T. (Bill) Hill, Jr. Kristin C. Hagge |
Mary Snider | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Mary Snider |
Ross Alan Lutz | Criminal - Appellant | Scala D. Byers |
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Henry M. Wade
F05-00112-IV
16 Yrs/$10,000 Fine