judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: L. THOMAS GREENE; BRENDA J. GREENE, APLT.

Case Information: 10-PR-0788
Short Caption:IN RE: L. THOMAS GREENE; BRENDA J. GREENE, APLT.Classification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:INT6-93Filed Date:06/21/2010

Opening Event Date:06/21/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/31/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/14/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBrenda J. Greene NPro SeN
AppelleeL. Thomas Greene N
W. David Allen NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/05/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 21, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
08/19/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 4/12/10) (elp)
08/31/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (4-pgs/tape 4/12/10 proc.)w/cd
08/31/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/16/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
09/23/2010RECORD INDEX
10/28/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 16, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
11/03/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (opp) (elp)
11/22/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion to dismiss this appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b). (ETW) elp
11/22/2010DISMISSED
12/14/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived