judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RITA ANN HUMPHREY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-249)
Case Number:06-249Case Docketed On:10/27/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:RITA ANN HUMPHREY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RITA ANN HUMPHREY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRita Ann HumphreyTina N. Olson
Donna D. Domonkos
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 67
Citation:185 P.3d 1236

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/27/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/27/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/27/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/26/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/29/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/14/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/14/2007Order - Grant - third extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
04/16/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
06/04/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/27/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, nine volumes. Volumes I - III, Original Pleadings; Volumes IV - VI, Transcripts; Volume VII, Confidential Information; Volume VIII, Exhibits; Volume IX, Prior Supreme Court Record (4 Vols.)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Leda Pojman on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Donna Domonkos and David E. Westling on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/18/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Donna D. Domonkos, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel and David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/18/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/16/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/02/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/02/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/07/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2 boxes). Record signed for 7/3/08 by Candice Ford.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal