judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCLEMORE (MARK D.) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32369
Short Caption:MCLEMORE (MARK D.) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33974
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C82059Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/20/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/18/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/18/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Re: Records on appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32316, 32369, 32409, 32410, 32430, 32464, 32471, 32482.
10/20/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/20/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (Copy.)
11/20/1998Other Other. Case submitted on the record on appeal this day.
08/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeal and Remanding for Entry of Corrected Judgment of Conviction. " . . . we dismiss this appeal and remand for the limited purpose of correcting the judgment of conviction." fn1[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] SNP99B-W,/MS/NB 00-14292
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14472
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14472