judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HASKELL INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL. v. JOE LEE FERGUSON, A. M. FERGUSON, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR

Case: A-96
A-96
03/16/1944
Application for Writ of Error
HASKELL INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.
JOE LEE FERGUSON, A. M. FERGUSON, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/20/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/19/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/03/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/31/1944Reply to ResponseRespondent
03/28/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
03/20/1944Letter brief Respondent
03/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/20/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/19/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/05/1944Order from Lower Court filed
04/03/1944Reply to Response
03/31/1944Reply to Response
03/28/1944Response to Petition
03/20/1944Letter brief
03/16/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
03/16/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joe Lee FergusonRespondent
A. M. Ferguson, Individually and as AdministratorRespondent
Haskell Independent School District, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information