Case: 04-95-00601-CR
04-95-00601-CR
08/07/1995
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Lorenzo Ramirez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/17/2000 | Motion Disposed | Dismissed | |
02/17/2000 | Order Entered | | |
02/08/2000 | Motion Filed | | |
10/20/1997 | Letter of Inquiry Filed | | |
02/10/1997 | Letter of Inquiry Filed | | |
01/08/1996 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
12/14/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/14/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/22/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
10/11/1995 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction | |
10/11/1995 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction | |
10/03/1995 | Response to Motion Filed | | |
10/03/1995 | Response to Motion Filed | | |
10/02/1995 | Response Received | | |
09/18/1995 | Order Entered | | |
09/06/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
08/07/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/27/1995 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/12/1995 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/14/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Steven C. Hilbig |
Lorenzo Ramirez | Criminal - Appellant | Lorenzo Ramirez David Jordan |
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Raymond Angelini
94-CR-7433
40 years TDCJ