Case: 13-03-00150-CR
13-03-00150-CR
03/10/2003
Aggravated Sexual Assault
ALFONSO RODRIGUEZ, JR.
THE STATE OF TEXAS
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/20/2006 | Record sent to storage | | |||
05/05/2005 | Letter Marked 'Received' | | |||
03/22/2005 | Record sent to storage | | |||
02/24/2005 | Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk | | |||
02/22/2005 | Letter Marked 'Received' | | |||
01/11/2005 | request for documents | | |||
11/08/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/12/2004 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
04/19/2004 | Submitted | | |||
03/29/2004 | Submission | | |||
12/22/2003 | supplemental clerk's record | | |||
12/22/2003 | Reinstate appeal | | |||
12/04/2003 | Order Issued with Disposition | Abated | | ||
10/24/2003 | Brief Filed | | |||
09/25/2003 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/12/2003 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
08/22/2003 | Green card in | | |||
08/14/2003 | Record checked in | | |||
08/13/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |||
08/13/2003 | No oral argument requested | | |||
08/13/2003 | Brief Filed | | |||
07/31/2003 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/31/2003 | Order Entered | | |||
07/31/2003 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/14/2003 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
07/14/2003 | Motion for Leave to File Motion _______ | | |||
06/05/2003 | Motion to File Motion ________ Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/05/2003 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/14/2003 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
05/14/2003 | Motion for Leave to File Motion _______ | | |||
05/08/2003 | CHECKOUT SHT FOR REQUESTED DOCUMENTS | | |||
05/07/2003 | CHECKOUT SHT FOR REQUESTED DOCUMENTS | | |||
04/14/2003 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
04/14/2003 | Court Reporter Pages | | |||
04/14/2003 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
03/27/2003 | 30 Day Letter Sent | | |||
03/10/2003 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
03/10/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/08/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Rodriguez, Jr., Alfonso | Appellant | Hon. Oscar Rene Flores |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Theodore C. Hake Amy Howell Alaniz |
Trial Court Information
206th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Rose Guerra Reyna
CR-1264-88-D
18 years TDCJ