Case: 11-04-00141-CV
11-04-00141-CV
05/21/2004
Divorce
Russell Brent Child
Hillary Brandise Leverton
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/15/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
02/05/2007 | Mandate issued | | |||
09/21/2006 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
09/21/2006 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
02/16/2006 | Submitted | | |||
01/26/2006 | Submission set in Eastland | | |||
01/05/2006 | Mot. - for postponement disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/05/2006 | Corrected entry made by clerks office | | |||
12/27/2005 | Mot. - to postpone filed | | |||
12/19/2005 | Mot. to postpone submission rec'd - not filed | | |||
12/07/2005 | Submission reset for later date and/or time. | | |||
11/28/2005 | Letter filed from . . . | | |||
11/17/2005 | Submission set in Eastland | | |||
11/03/2005 | Mot. - for postponement disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/03/2005 | Corrected entry made by clerks office | | |||
10/31/2005 | Mot. - to postpone filed | | |||
10/20/2005 | Submission set in Eastland | | |||
04/07/2005 | Reply brief filed | | |||
03/17/2005 | Extension of time to file reply brief acted on by Court | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/11/2005 | Extension of time to file Reply Brief | | |||
02/22/2005 | Brief filed | | |||
02/22/2005 | Case ready to be set | | |||
01/31/2005 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/25/2005 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |||
12/02/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/24/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |||
10/22/2004 | Brief filed | | |||
09/17/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/15/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |||
08/26/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/19/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |||
07/22/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/16/2004 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |||
06/23/2004 | Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed | | |||
06/14/2004 | Record received | | |||
06/14/2004 | supplemental clerk record and/or reporter record | | |||
06/14/2004 | Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed | | |||
06/07/2004 | Record received | | |||
05/21/2004 | Filing fee paid | | |||
05/21/2004 | docketing statement received | | |||
05/19/2004 | Notice of appeal filed | | |||
04/01/2004 | motion for new trial filed in trial court | | |||
03/24/2004 | Judgment of trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/05/2007 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Leverton, Hillary Brandise | Appellee | Celia D. Trimble |
Child, Ressell Brent | Appellant | Cynthia Rucker Allen |
Trial Court Information
326th District Court
Taylor
Honorable Aleta D. Hacker, Judge
35,607-C