judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERICA JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0776
Short Caption:ERICA JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM541-10Filed Date:05/28/2010

Opening Event Date:05/28/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/09/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/01/2010
Argued/Submitted:04/21/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/21/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantErica Johnson Y
Vicki C. BryantYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Emily C. Scruggs YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Vickie Bryant, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/19/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Vickie Bryant, Esquire
08/03/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
08/26/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (Additional RT) no oppo.
08/26/2010RECEIVED Appellant's Amended Statement Regarding Transcript.
09/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (3pgs/Tape) 3/9/10 proc.
09/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (6pgs/Tape) 4/20/10 proc.
09/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (76pgs/Walker) 5/25/10 proc.
09/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (141pgs/Walker) 5/26/10 proc. w/CD included
09/09/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/20/2010ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
09/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
09/21/2010RECORD INDEX
09/21/2010RECORD COPIES
11/01/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/01/2010APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
12/01/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
12/01/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
03/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/21/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/21/2011SUBMITTED (Judges Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, Wagner)
06/29/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Wagner, Senior Judge.)
07/21/2011FiledMandate