judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THE BANK OF NEW YORK TRUSTEE UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT SERIES 1997; and MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS, INC., a corporation v. FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF STEAMBOAT SPRINGS, N.A.

Case Heading (06-4)
Case Number:06-4Case Docketed On:01/05/2006
Linked To: 06-3
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:THE BANK OF NEW YORK TRUSTEE UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT SERIES 1997; and MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS, INC., a corporation v. FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF STEAMBOAT SPRINGS, N.A.
Full Title:THE BANK OF NEW YORK TRUSTEE UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT SERIES 1997; and MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS, INC., a corporation, Appellants (Defendants), v. FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF STEAMBOAT SPRINGS, N.A., Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThe Bank of New YorkJames R. Salisbury
Sean Charles Chambers
AppellantMortgage Electronic Systems, Inc.James R. Salisbury
Sean Charles Chambers
AppelleeFirst National Bank of Steamboat Springs, N.A.Thomas A. Thompson
Brandon Wayne Snyder

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2006 WY 132
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/05/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/05/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/05/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/21/2006Brief - Appellants; received copy of brief on cd; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
04/05/2006Motion - Consolidate briefs.MotionConsolidateFinal
04/05/2006Order - Granting motion to consolidate briefs.OrderGrantFinal
04/07/2006Brief - Appellee - consolidated; and received copy of brief on disk. Received designation of record - captioned in Supreme Court - returned to counsel with note to file in district court.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/14/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/24/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/28/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I & II, original papers; volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/24/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before full court (James R. Salisbury and Sean C. Chambers, argument by Mr. Salisbury for appellant; Thomas A. Thompson for appellee) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/15/2006Motion - Substitution of partyMotionSubstitution of partyFinal
08/17/2006Response/Objection - Motion for substitution of a party.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/06/2006Order - Denying motion for substitution of a party.OrderDenyFinal
10/17/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/02/2006Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/02/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/02/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/03/2006Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal