judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

QUADE VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34734
Short Caption:QUADE VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9903094Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Paul E. Quade, Esq.--check no. 1283.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08006
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file the docketing statement; within 15 days from the date of this order file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request; and within 120 days from the date of this order file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-11357
12/16/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Real Party in Interest (Respondent), Jerry Hoover's, Police Chief City of Reno, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. 99-12767
12/17/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 99-12839
01/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, we grant appellant's moiton and " . . . dismiss this appeal, with the parties to bear their own costs." fn1[In light of this order, the motion to dismiss filed by Jerry Hoover, who is the respondent in the district court proceeding, is denied as moot]. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-00776
01/18/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.