Case: 14-03-00707-CR
14-03-00707-CR
06/18/2003
Sexual Assault
Harris, James
The State of Texas
No
11th Court of Appeals
07/08/2003
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/28/2003 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |
07/15/2003 | Record due | | |
07/10/2003 | Docketing statement DUE | | |
07/08/2003 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | GRANTED | |
06/25/2003 | Clerks Certification Letter Sent | | |
06/17/2003 | Case began in court of appeals | | |
06/16/2003 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
05/16/2003 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/08/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | William J. Delmore, III |
Harris, James | Criminal - Appellant | Windi Akins Pastorini |
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
Honorable MARY LOU KEEL
909,331
5yrs DAB & $300 fine