judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ROAD DISTRICT NUMBER 1, OF JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXAS v. GROVER SELLERS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS, LINCOLN LIBERTY LIFE INSURANCE, ET AL.

Case: A-100
A-100
03/18/1944
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
ROAD DISTRICT NUMBER 1, OF JEFFERSON COUNTY, TEXAS
GROVER SELLERS, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS, LINCOLN LIBERTY LIFE INSURANCE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/03/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/03/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/03/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/03/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/03/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/01/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/28/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/28/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/27/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/26/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/18/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/29/1944Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
03/29/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
03/29/1944Letter brief
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/03/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/03/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/03/1944Brief on the Merits
05/03/1944Brief on the Merits
05/03/1944Response to Petition
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/02/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/01/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/29/1944Motion to dismissFiling granted
04/28/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/28/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/27/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/26/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/18/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/11/1944sheriff's return
04/11/1944sheriff's return
04/11/1944sheriff's return
04/11/1944sheriff's return
04/10/1944Submission reset
03/29/1944Notice of rehearing, etc.
03/29/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
03/29/1944Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
03/29/1944Letter brief
03/24/1944Motion to dismiss
03/18/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C. T. GettysAmicus Curiae
Road District Number 1, of Jefferson County, TexasRelator
Pat DoughertyAmicus Curiae
Black, Graves and StaytonAmicus Curiae
Grover Sellers, Attorney General of TexasRespondent
Lincoln Liberty Life Insurance, et al.Respondent
Robert Harrison, et al.Amicus Curiae
Fulbright, Crooker, Freeman and Bates, et al.Amicus Curiae
Rosser J. Coke and George Waverly BriggsAmicus Curiae
Great National Life Insurance CompanyAmicus Curiae
Southwestern Life Insurance CompanyAmicus Curiae
Vinson, Elkins, Weems and Francis, et al.Amicus Curiae
R. F. ChapmanAmicus Curiae
Eugene de BogoryAmicus Curiae
Vinson, Elkins, Weems and Francis, et al.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information