judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEWIS A. ROGERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0777
Short Caption:LEWIS A. ROGERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM3022-09Filed Date:05/17/2010

Opening Event Date:05/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/09/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLewis A. Rogers N
Billy L. PondsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Kristina L. AmentNY
Nicholas P. ColemanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (By: JAC)
08/24/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo).
08/24/2010RECEIVED Appellant's Statement Regarding Transcript.
09/10/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk
09/10/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)
12/27/2010 It appearing that appellant has been notified by the Court Reporting Division of the Superior Court that the transcripts requested for this appeal have been prepared and are ready for transmittal to this court, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order make the necessary arrangements to have the transcripts transmitted to this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file a notice showing that appellant has paid for the transcript and attach a copy of the receipt to the notice. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: JAC)
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (88 pgs/Gilliam - 3/31/10 proc.)
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (160 pgs/Hunt - 4/23/10 proc.)
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (15 pgs/Ott - 5/13/10 proc.)(w/CD)
01/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (Superior Court filing dated 5/13/10) (2 copies) ****(SEALED)****
01/05/2011NOTICE RECEIVED - from aplt regarding transcript preparation and receipt of payment (see order of 12/27/10)
01/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/17/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 4/25/11. no oppo
02/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before April 25, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/19/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/25/11. no oppo
05/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before May 25, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
06/01/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 4, 2011, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before May 25, 2011, and it appearing that the brief and limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. (Castillo)
06/01/2011RECEIVED - Aplt's Motion for Leave to File Brief and Appellant's Brief w/o Appendix (Additional copies required - attorney notified by phone)
06/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)
06/01/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
06/01/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appendix
06/15/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until August 1, 2011 (unopposed)
06/29/2011ORDER GRANTING APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of appellee for an extension of time within which to file the brief is granted and the brief shall be filed on or before August 1, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/29/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/29/2011APPENDIX
08/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/01/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/08/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
11/09/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Wagner, King, Nebeker
11/15/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Wagner, Nebeker and King, Senior Judges.)
12/12/2011FiledMandate