judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CASEY J. MIMS v. MICHAEL W. MIMS

Case Heading (06-241)
Case Number:06-241Case Docketed On:10/20/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:CASEY J. MIMS v. MICHAEL W. MIMS
Full Title:CASEY J. MIMS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. MICHAEL W. MIMS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCasey J. MimsMitchell E. Osborn
AppelleeMichael W. MimsWallace L. Stock
Samuel Brian Shumway

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/20/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/20/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/20/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/20/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/04/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/05/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/22/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/31/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/02/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/20/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/02/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume: Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/02/2007Order - Sanction - designation of record - both partiesOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
03/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/06/2007Fees - Sanctions received - designation - Bailey, Stock & Harmon.FeesSanctions received - designationFinal
03/13/2007Fees - Sanctions received - designation - OsbornFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
04/12/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
04/12/2007Memorandum - In support of motion to dismissMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
05/01/2007Order - Dismiss - involuntary (moot).OrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
05/17/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/17/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal