judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID J. STOKES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 85-CF-0963
Short Caption:DAVID J. STOKES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:85-CF-0963Consolidated: 85-CF-1175
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4025-84Filed Date:07/09/1985

Opening Event Date:07/09/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/18/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/06/1987
Argued/Submitted:07/08/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid J. Stokes N
Mindy A. DanielsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Joan Ann Barton YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STOKES, DAVID J. AKA DAVID STONE UNITED STATES
07/09/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/18/1986FiledRecord Completed
03/06/1987FiledBriefing Completed
07/08/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/22/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition