Case: 05-03-01005-CR
05-03-01005-CR
07/08/2003
Forgery
Wamsley, Eric Isaih AKA Ross, Ronnie Kenneth
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/21/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/21/2004 | Memorandum Opinion | Dismissed | |
01/21/2004 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
01/21/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/21/2004 | Memorandum Opinion | Dismissed | |
01/20/2004 | Submission | | |
01/20/2004 | Submitted | | |
01/14/2004 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
09/12/2003 | Brief Due | | |
08/13/2003 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
07/21/2003 | Record due | | |
07/18/2003 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
07/18/2003 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
07/09/2003 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
07/08/2003 | 25.2 Certification filed | | |
07/08/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/08/2003 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
06/23/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
05/22/2003 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/21/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Eric Isaih Wamsley | Criminal - Appellant | Jeff P. Buchwald |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | William T. (Bill) Hill, Jr. |
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Karen J. Greene
F02-00165-S
2 Yrs/$1000 Fine