judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GAUTHIER VS. LVMPD

Case Information: 36223
Short Caption:GAUTHIER VS. LVMPDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A395098
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A396145
Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/09/2000 / Cohen, LarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/17/2002 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:09/17/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/05/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Thomas D. Beatty--check no. 10611.
06/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09376
06/05/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
06/09/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry J. Cohen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/12/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: May 30, 2000. 00-09903
11/09/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Debra Gauthier hereby substitutes Gayle Nathan as attorney in place of Thomas D. Beatty. 00-19742
11/14/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. Larry J. Cohen.
12/04/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing of Substitution of Attorney. 00-21149
12/11/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The Settlement Judge will continue to keep this Court informed of the progess of settlement negotiations. 00-21634
05/31/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-09126
05/31/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
06/13/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-09851
06/13/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-09861
06/22/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Added law firm of Marquis & Aurbach to docket sheet. 01-10562
06/29/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Law firm of Marquis & Aurbach. 01-11031
07/02/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-11118
07/17/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Gayle Nathan in place and stead of Richard Segerblom as counsel for appellant. 01-12165
07/26/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for substitution of attorney. 01-12680
10/15/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Corrected brief due: 10 days.
10/15/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 10 days.
10/25/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: UPS. 01-17982
10/25/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 11. 01-17983
11/05/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-18435
11/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Resolving Motion or Stipulation. On November 5, 2001, respondents filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. No good cause appearing, we deny respondents' motion to dismiss. We remind respondents that the answering brief is due thirty days from the date of service from appellant's corrected opening brief. 01-18813
11/14/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and Counter Motion for Additional Time for Respondent to file an Answering Brief. (No action necessary per AH). 01-18976
11/19/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 50 pages. 01-19296
11/28/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 11/26/01. 01-19906
11/28/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-19908
12/31/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Returned Unfiled Appellants' Reply Brief. Corrected brief due: 10 days.
01/07/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 01/03/02. 02-00422
02/01/2002Other Other. Filed Table of Contents. 02/25/02 ORDER: STRICKEN. 02-02186
02/01/2002Other Other. Filed Table of Contents. 02/25/02 ORDER: STRICKEN. 02-02187
02/25/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 28, 2002, appellant in Docket No. 37586 filed her opening brief and appendix. Because the opening brief did not contain a table of contents as required by NRAP 28(a)(1), the clerk of this court requested counsel for appellant, Gayle F. Nathan, to submit a table of contents within 10 days. On February 1, 2002, Ms. Nathan's office filed, in Docket No. 36223, a letter and two tables of contents. Because it appears that the tables of contents were filed in Docket No. 36223 in error, we direct the clerk of this court to strike the tables of contents filed in Docket No. 36223 on February 1, 2002. Further, because it appears that neither table of contents is a table of contents for appellant's opening brief in Docket No. 37586, we direct Ms. Nathan to file a table of contents for the opening brief filed in Docket No. 37586 within 10 days from the date of this order. Nos. 36223/37586-cases are not consolidated. 02-03441
07/25/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on September 17, 2002, at 11:30 a.m. (SNP03-MS/ML/NB)
09/03/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
09/12/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Order on Related Issue (filed via fax). 02-15857
09/16/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Order on Related Issue. (original--filed via fax on 9/12/02) 02-16135
09/17/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
05/05/2003MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal with Prejudice by Stipulation of the Parties. 03-07575
05/23/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. We elect to treat the "Motion to Dismiss Appeal With Prejudice by Stipulation of the Parties" filed on May 5, 2003 as a stipulation to dismiss this appeal, and we approve the stipulation. "This appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-08743
05/23/2003Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.