judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

G. T. ACQUISITION 1, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, d/b/a GRAND TARGHEE SKI AND SUMMER RESORT v. KELLI M. POLAND and MICHAEL E. POLAND, husband and wife

Case Heading (06-7)
Case Number:06-7Case Docketed On:01/06/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:G. T. ACQUISITION 1, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, d/b/a GRAND TARGHEE SKI AND SUMMER RESORT v. KELLI M. POLAND and MICHAEL E. POLAND, husband and wife
Full Title:G. T. ACQUISITION 1, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, d/b/a GRAND TARGHEE SKI AND SUMMER RESORT, Appellant (Defendant), v. KELLI M. POLAND and MICHAEL E. POLAND, husband and wife, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantG. T. Acquisition 1, LLCJames Kent Lubing
AppelleeKelli M. PolandJeffrey Allen Tennyson
AppelleeMichael E. PolandJeffrey Allen Tennyson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/06/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/22/2006Notice-Incoming - Other. Received message from counsel that the case has settled and will be dismissed. (E-mailed on 2/19/06)Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
02/23/2006Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
03/06/2006Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
03/07/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/07/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal