judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DELANT CORY PALMERTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CV-0800
Short Caption:DELANT CORY PALMERTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAC7501-09Filed Date:06/22/2010

Opening Event Date:06/22/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/11/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/18/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/20/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDelant Cory Palmerton NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
R. Craig LawrenceYY
Daria J. ZaneNN
Wynne Kelly NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/26/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(a). (BY: ETW)
07/26/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
08/11/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
09/07/2010 ORDERED that any appeal taken from the JANUARY 15, 2010, ORDER IS UNTIMELY FILED and therefore this appeal IS LIMITED to the trial court's order signed on MAY 24, 2010 and docketed on May 25, 2010 denying appellant's motion to void dismissal and reconsider...It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court of the record index in accordance w/DC App R. 11(b)(3)(A). (KRSTFA) (rm)
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX
10/06/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/16/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/16/2010APPENDIX (attached to brief)
11/22/2010APPEARANCE of Daria J. Zane on behalf of Aple.
11/22/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to January 11, 2011.
12/01/2010APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for extension of time to file brief
12/06/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, and the opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before January 11, 2011. (ETW) elp
01/10/2011APPEARANCE- of Daria Zane on behalf of aple
01/11/2011RECEIVED - from aplt Notice of objections for the record and on the record *regarding a possible 2nd enlargment of time for appellee to file the Brief (elp)
01/11/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/11/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/28/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
02/17/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
02/23/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY- emergency injunction emergency temporary restraining cease and desist
02/23/2011TMC - EMERGENCY motion to stay, for temporary restraining...
02/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED as he does not meet the standard for the granting of a stay. Barry v. Washington Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987). (GLTHTE) (rm)
03/07/2011RECEIVED-from aplt affavdit fact of mailing
03/22/2011APPEARANCE of Wynne Kelly as counsel for aple.
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/19/2011RECEIVED - from aplt Judicial Notice of Obstruction of Justice (no cert. of service)
04/19/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED - fro aplt to the following: 2420 Demaray Drive, Grants Pass, OR 97527 Phone: 541-472-1294
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT (Titled: Judicial notice petition demand for two or more hours for oral arguments and review)
05/04/2011RECEIVED - notification of administrative violations filed in Circuit Court of Oregon for County of Jackson. *See entry dated May 17, 2011, re: Letter from Clerk
05/11/2011On consideration of pro se appellant's motion for two or more hours for oral argument and review, and it appearing that this matter is scheduled on the Summary Calendar of May 18, 2011, it is ORDERED on behalf of the merits division assigned to consider this matter that the motion is denied. This matter will be submitted for decision on May 18, 2011, on the record and briefs filed without argument by any party. (JAC)
05/17/2011LETTER from Clerk to Mr. Delant-Cory: Palmerton, Private Attorney General regarding D.C. Freedom of Information Act.
05/18/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/18/2011APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
05/18/2011RECEIVED-aplt's documents to be supplement
05/18/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Washington, Thompson, Farrell
05/26/2011On consideration of pro se appellant's motion to supplement the record on appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion is denied as moot. (WH,TH,FA)
05/26/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Thompson, associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
06/20/2011MANDATE ISSUED
07/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (titled as: judicial notice of objection reconsideration to opinion and judgment 5/26/11
08/09/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion for reconsideration.
03/09/2012LodgedReceived pro se documents (Appellant)