judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CHARLES H. HARRIS, ET AL. v. CITY OF FORT WORTH, ET AL.

Case: A-84
A-84
03/07/1944
Application for Writ of Error
CHARLES H. HARRIS, ET AL.
CITY OF FORT WORTH, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/17/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/29/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/07/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/22/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/13/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
03/07/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/12/1944Letter Filed
05/17/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/29/1944Supplemental Brief filed
04/07/1944Brief on the Merits
03/25/1944Bond
03/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
03/22/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/13/1944Response to Petition
03/07/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/07/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Burford, Ryburn, Hincks and CharltonAmicus Curiae
Charles H. Harris, et al.Petitioner
City of Fort Worth, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information