Case: 08-06-00203-CR
08-06-00203-CR
07/24/2006
Murder
Christopher Buchanan
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/26/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||||
08/15/2008 | Letter filed | | |||||
08/14/2008 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
09/27/2007 | Submitted | | |||||
08/03/2007 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
06/04/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
06/04/2007 | Brief Filed | | |||||
05/21/2007 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
05/21/2007 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
04/04/2007 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/04/2007 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
03/05/2007 | Brief Filed | | |||||
01/30/2007 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/30/2007 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
11/28/2006 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/28/2006 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
11/21/2006 | Reporter/Recorder's Record filed. | | |||||
11/20/2006 | Affidavit from Reporter Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/20/2006 | Affidavit from Reporter Filed | | |||||
10/10/2006 | Affidavit from Reporter Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
10/10/2006 | Affidavit from Reporter Filed | | |||||
09/29/2006 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
08/30/2006 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/14/2006 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |||||
07/26/2006 | Miscellaneous filing | | |||||
07/24/2006 | NOA not in compliance - notice | | |||||
07/24/2006 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/26/2008 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Toni R. Estaville Hon. Jaime E. Esparza |
Buchanan, Christopher | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Matthew DeKoatz |
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Guadalupe Rivera
20050D01234
28 IDTDCJ