Case: 05-03-00761-CV
05-03-00761-CV
05/29/2003
Summary Judgment
Retail Motorcycle Ventures, Inc. d/b/a BMW & Triumph of North Dallas & Carl B. Diehl
Don Rapport & Associates, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/10/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/10/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/18/2004 | Opinion to Publishers | | |
06/14/2004 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/05/2004 | Letter Filed | | |
05/04/2004 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |
05/04/2004 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
04/19/2004 | Memorandum Opinion | Reversed and Remanded | |
04/19/2004 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
04/19/2004 | Memorandum Opinion | Reversed and Remanded | |
03/23/2004 | Submitted | | |
03/23/2004 | Submission | | |
03/23/2004 | Submitted | | |
03/09/2004 | Letter Filed | | |
01/21/2004 | Submission | | |
11/07/2003 | Reply Brief Filed | | |
10/20/2003 | Brief Filed | | |
10/20/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/20/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/19/2003 | Brief Due | | |
10/18/2003 | Record due | | |
09/26/2003 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
09/19/2003 | Brief Filed | | |
08/19/2003 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
07/15/2003 | Letter Filed | | |
07/08/2003 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
06/20/2003 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |
06/06/2003 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |
06/06/2003 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
05/29/2003 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
05/29/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
05/29/2003 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/27/2003 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |
05/27/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
05/12/2003 | Findings of Fact & Conclusion of Law Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/18/2010 | Status | Destroy record |
09/10/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Don Rapport & Associates, Inc. | Appellee | Paul A. Derks |
Charles Sandoval | Judge - Trial Court | Collin Judge |
Retail Motorcycle Ventures | Appellant | James C. Mosser |
Kenneth R. Stein | Appellee | Kenneth R. Stein |
Hannah Kunkle | Trial court clerk | Hannah Kunkle |
Trial Court Information
380th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Charles F Sandoval
380-00585-02