Case: 14-85-00394-CV
14-85-00394-CV
05/14/1985
Miscellaneous civil
Allied Deer Park Bank
Clear Lake National Bank, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/10/1985 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/26/1985 | No description available. | | |
07/11/1985 | Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | GRANTED | |
07/11/1985 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
06/17/1985 | Attorney's affidavit filed | | |
06/14/1985 | Motion to reconsider filed | | |
06/06/1985 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |
06/06/1985 | No description available. | DENIED | |
05/31/1985 | No description available. | | |
05/14/1985 | Letter from atty with address change | | |
05/14/1985 | No description available. | | |
01/31/1985 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/10/1985 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee |
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
85-00252