Case: 14-95-00795-CR
14-95-00795-CR
07/13/1995
Capital Murder
Mouton, Delvin Roshon
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/16/1996 | Case stored | | |
07/08/1996 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
07/08/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/08/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/24/1996 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
06/07/1996 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
05/23/1996 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
05/23/1996 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
04/30/1996 | Submitted | | |
04/30/1996 | Submission | | |
04/30/1996 | Submitted | | |
03/21/1996 | Submission | | |
03/14/1996 | State's brief DUE | | |
03/06/1996 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
03/06/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/06/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/22/1996 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
02/13/1996 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
02/05/1996 | State's brief DUE | | |
01/18/1996 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
01/11/1996 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
01/04/1996 | State's brief DUE | | |
12/08/1995 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
12/07/1995 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
11/02/1995 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
10/25/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/25/1995 | Past due brief | | |
10/23/1995 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
09/21/1995 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
09/21/1995 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
09/12/1995 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
09/12/1995 | Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL | | |
09/07/1995 | No description available. | | |
08/31/1995 | Record due | | |
08/31/1995 | Statement of Facts Due | | |
08/31/1995 | Transcript FILED | | |
07/13/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/10/1995 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
05/31/1995 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |
05/03/1995 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/18/2017 | Case Stored | Case archived |
07/08/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MOUTON, DELVIN ROSHON | Criminal - Appellant | Hattie Sewell Shannon |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Dan McCrory |
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable JANICE M. KROCKER
94-20794
LIFE tdc.