Case: 07-0538
07-0538
07/06/2007
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
TERRENCE M. GORE
HOMECOMINGS FINANCIAL NETWORK, INC. WILSHIRE FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, AND WILSHIRE CREDIT CORP.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/09/2007 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to Pet Rev. | |
08/09/2007 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Filed on behalf of Terrence M. Gore, (12) appendix attached | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/15/2007 | Case Stored | G02 ROW 5 E-5 | | |
11/07/2007 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order sent to the Court of Appeals | | |
09/21/2007 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
08/21/2007 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
08/17/2007 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Denied | Motion to Dismiss Appeal for lack of jurisdiction denied | |
08/16/2007 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Pet's m/e/t to file petition for review granted. petition filed on 8/9/07 | |
08/16/2007 | Response to Motion filed | Pet's response to motion to dismiss (incorporated w/reply to response to motion). On behalf of Terrance M. Gore. (12) | | |
08/16/2007 | Reply to Response to Motion | Pet's reply to response to motion (incorporated w/response to motion to dismiss). On behalf of Terrence M. Gore. (12) | | |
08/15/2007 | Response Waiver filed | Response waiver filed on behalf of Homecomings Financial Network, Inc., et al. (12) | | |
08/09/2007 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Spoke w/ Terrence M. Gore. Requested the $75.00 filing fee. | | |
08/09/2007 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to Pet Rev. | | |
08/09/2007 | Petition for Review | Filed on behalf of Terrence M. Gore, (12) appendix attached | | |
07/24/2007 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Spoke with Ronald Chin & requested $10.00 fee for Motion to Dismiss. He said that he would overnight it. | | |
07/24/2007 | Motion to dismiss | Filed on behalf of Homecomings Financial Network, et al., Motion to Dismiss Appeal for L.O.J. (incorporated with objectio to M/E/T to file Pet Rev. | | |
07/24/2007 | Response to Motion filed | Appellees' Objection to appellant's M/E/T to file Pet Rev, incorporated with motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction. (12) On behalf of Homecomings Financial Network, Inc. et al. | | |
07/23/2007 | Call received | From Mr. Chin's office letting the Court know that they will be faxing a copy of the response to the m/e/t and they will also overnight the hard copies. | | |
07/19/2007 | Call received | from Mr. Ronald Chin and he is the lead counsel for the respondents. He called letting the Court know that resps opposed the 53.7 motion and will be filing a response n/l/t Monday, 7/23/07. | | |
07/17/2007 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | to Mr. Jason Starks. Re: if resp opposed or unopposed the 53.7 motion. Per Mr. Starks, he is no longer working on this case. He thinks that his former employer, Balcom Law Firm, P.C., was handling this case. | | |
07/16/2007 | Additional Copies received | A copy of 53.7 motion that was sent to the 5th COA. On behalf of Terrence M. Gore. (1) | | |
07/09/2007 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Left msg w/ Mr. Sparks to see if resp is opposed or unopposed to the m/e/t to file pet/rev. | | |
07/06/2007 | Notice requesting filing fee | Sent letter requesting $10.00 fee for 53.7(f) motion to Mr. Gore. | ||
07/06/2007 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | M/e/t to file pet/rev. Filed on behalf of Terrence M. Gore (12) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
11/15/2007 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02 ROW 5 E-5 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gore, Terrence M. | Petitioner | Mr. Terrence M. Gore |
Homecomings Financial Network, Inc. | Respondent | Mr. Michael Pei-shen Lin Mr. Gregory Allen Balcom Mr. Ronald Patrick Chin Ms. Ester Dolores Gonzales Mr. Matthew T. Wright Mr. Paul C. (Pat) Murphy IV Mr. Thomas David Pruyn Mr. Jason Andrew Starks |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-07-00122-CV
Dismissed [duplicate 1]
___ SW3d ___, 03-29-07
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Amos Louis Mazzant
Trial Court Information
101st District Court
Dallas
Honorable Jay Patterson
06-03158