judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MORENO (RAFAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34722
Short Caption:MORENO (RAFAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40329 , 53026
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141248Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/11/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07979
08/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Second Notice of Appeal. 99-08059
09/16/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed 9/3/99. Due Date: 10 days
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order appealed from filed in district court on: September 3, 1999. 99-09191
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34633, 34660, 34722, 34836, 34848, 34871, 34910. 99-11138
02/11/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 00-02228
02/11/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/27/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-10812
07/24/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10859
07/24/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/15/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 2, 2001. 01-10859