judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JEREMY GEORGE MERTA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-227)
Case Number:06-227Case Docketed On:10/06/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:JEREMY GEORGE MERTA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JEREMY GEORGE MERTA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJeremy George Merta Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
D. Michael Pauling
Timothy Justin Forwood
Terry L. Armitage

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 137
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/18/2006Notice-Incoming - Change of address of appellantNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
11/01/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/07/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/11/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/23/2007Motion - Second extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/24/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/28/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/02/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/20/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/26/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts and PSI.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/24/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/31/2007Service - Mail returned - opinion mailed to appellant returned, "Return to Sender, Not Here"ServiceMail returnedFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/11/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/11/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/14/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/19/2007Service - Mail returned "Return to Sender - Refused - Unable to Forward"ServiceMail returnedFinal