judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TOMEEKA BROOKS V. MURRAY'S FAMILY OF FINE FOODS

Case Information: 10-AA-0762
Short Caption:TOMEEKA BROOKS V. MURRAY'S FAMILY OF FINE FOODSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES944-10Filed Date:06/25/2010

Opening Event Date:06/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/28/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerTomeeka Brooks NPro SeN
RespondentMurray's Family of Fine FoodN
Meredith S. Campbell NN
RespondentDepartment of Employment ServicesN
Todd S. KimNY
Donna M. MuraskyNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/25/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
06/25/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
07/01/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to June 25, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
07/01/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
07/15/2010APPEARANCE of Meredith Campbell on behalf of Resp.
09/28/2010RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO REMAND (DOES)
10/27/2010ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT MOTION TO REMAND
10/27/2010REMANDED
10/27/2010VACATED
10/28/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived