Case: 13-04-00149-CR
13-04-00149-CR
03/19/2004
Murder
PAUL JOSEPH SHOEMAKER
THE STATE OF TEXAS
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/2018 | Case stored | | |||
10/12/2012 | Case stored | | |||
10/05/2012 | Record checked in | | |||
07/26/2012 | Record checked out | | |||
07/20/2012 | Letter filed | | |||
06/25/2007 | Document filed | | |||
06/19/2007 | Case stored | | |||
06/12/2007 | Record checked out | | |||
06/12/2007 | Mandate issued | | |||
05/25/2007 | Case returned from higher court | | |||
04/18/2007 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | | ||
02/07/2007 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||
12/11/2006 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||
11/09/2006 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
09/15/2006 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||
08/31/2006 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
08/31/2006 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
08/25/2006 | Submitted | | |||
08/08/2006 | Submission | | |||
02/23/2006 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Carried with the case | | ||
02/23/2006 | Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSED | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/23/2006 | Additional Copies of Brief | | |||
02/23/2006 | Motion for leave to file brief additional copy | | |||
02/23/2006 | Motion to Strike | | |||
02/13/2006 | Brief Filed | | |||
02/13/2006 | Motion to Strike | | |||
02/13/2006 | Oral argument requested | | |||
02/13/2006 | Brief received. | | |||
02/13/2006 | Motion for leave to file brief | | |||
01/03/2006 | Oral argument denied | | |||
12/21/2005 | Record checked in | | |||
12/20/2005 | Record checked out | | |||
12/15/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/02/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
11/22/2005 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/09/2005 | supplemental clerk's record | | |||
11/04/2005 | Case ready to be set | | |||
11/04/2005 | Motion Filed | | |||
11/04/2005 | Oral argument requested | | |||
11/04/2005 | Brief Filed | | |||
10/27/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/17/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
10/12/2005 | Supplemental Reporter Record Pages | | |||
10/12/2005 | supplemental reporter record filed | | |||
09/14/2005 | request for documents | | |||
08/26/2005 | request for documents | | |||
08/05/2005 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/05/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/26/2005 | Motion to Supplement | | |||
07/26/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
06/27/2005 | Court Reporter Pages | | |||
06/27/2005 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
06/15/2005 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
06/07/2005 | request for documents | | |||
05/23/2005 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
05/06/2005 | request for documents | | |||
04/25/2005 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
04/04/2005 | request for documents | | |||
03/30/2005 | Notice of no record received | | |||
03/15/2005 | supplemental clerk's record | | |||
03/03/2005 | Reinstate appeal | | |||
03/03/2005 | Notice of no record received | | |||
03/03/2005 | request for documents | | |||
03/03/2005 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
03/03/2005 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
03/03/2005 | supplemental clerk's record | | |||
01/07/2005 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
12/03/2004 | request for documents | | |||
11/18/2004 | 30 Day Letter Sent | | |||
11/18/2004 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
10/22/2004 | 10 day ltr. to tr.ct. re: findings | | |||
09/16/2004 | Order Issued with Disposition | Abated | | ||
09/16/2004 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | conditionally granted | | ||
09/09/2004 | Reinstate appeal | | |||
09/09/2004 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
06/29/2004 | Motion to withdraw as counsel | | |||
06/18/2004 | Notice of no record received | | |||
06/18/2004 | request for documents | | |||
06/16/2004 | Notice of no record received | | |||
06/16/2004 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
06/09/2004 | request for documents | | |||
04/29/2004 | Order Issued with Disposition | Abated | | ||
04/29/2004 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | conditionally granted | | ||
04/12/2004 | Motion to withdraw as counsel | | |||
03/19/2004 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/12/2007 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Lawrence J. Rabb Armando R. Villalobos |
Shoemaker, Paul Joseph | PRO SE | Hon. Philip T. Cowen |
Trial Court Information
Cameron
Honorable Abel C. Limas
02-CR-1605-G
30 Yrs TDC