judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH BARNEY SHEARSON VS. WELLER

Case Information: 34721
Short Caption:SMITH BARNEY SHEARSON VS. WELLERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A387687Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Smith, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Hale, Lane, Peek, Dennison, Howard & Anderson.
08/26/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Schreck Morris--check no. 11307.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07977
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 99-08437
09/08/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee for cross-appeal due.
09/13/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Keith E. Galliher, Jr. for cross-appeal--check no. 26046.
09/16/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Notice of Entry of 7/22/99 order. Due Date: 10 days
09/17/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
10/01/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Clark County Clerk. No notice of entry of order for the July 22, 1999, order has been filed as of September 29, 1999. 99-09429
10/18/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-10113
12/01/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant/Cross-Respondent and Respondent/Cross-Appellant: 15 days to file a docketing statement and to comply with NRAP 9(a); Appellant/Cross-Respondent: 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant/cross-respondent and respondent/cross-appellant-two firms). 99-11968
12/10/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross Appellant. 99-12444
12/20/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross Respondent 99-12950
12/21/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 12, 1999. To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. 99-12969
12/21/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-12970
03/27/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 1, 2000. 00-04834
05/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court reporter Smith shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the requested transcripts conducted on July 12, 1999 or file a motion for an extension of time to fie and serve the requested transcripts. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of appellant's appeal as abandoned. 00-08495
06/01/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation of Dismissal of Appeal and Cross-Appeal. 00-09234
06/09/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. of Court Reporter Patsy k. Smith. 00-09787
06/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 00-10133
06/14/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.