judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KORITA JONES V. ADRIANNE TODMAN, ET AL

Case Information: 10-OA-0020
Short Caption:KORITA JONES V. ADRIANNE TODMAN, ET ALClassification:Original Jurisdiction - Original Actions - Mandamus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:06/25/2010

Opening Event Date:06/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerKorita Jones N
Thomas MarkNN
RespondentAdrianne Todman N
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Mashanda MosleyNN
RespondentRonald Mccoy N
Mashanda MosleyNN
Hans Froelicher, IVNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/25/2010PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS - FILED PER 7/28/10 ORDER LW Held in Abeyance
06/25/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (Served by: DCCA on 6/28/10).
07/19/2010TMC - (LODGED) petition for writ of mandamus - motion for IFP
07/28/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk SHALL FILE the LODGED PWM. It is *****MORE*****
07/28/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that RESPONDENT DCHA and its INTERIM EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR shall w/n 10 days from the date of this order, file a response to the PWM, addressing why a final order has not been issued. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the PWM IS HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending the responses. (GLOBKN) (jl)
08/12/2010RESP MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE- to the order of July 28, 2010 (DCHA)
08/17/2010PETITIONER'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to repondent's motion for extension of time to respond to the order of 7/28/10
08/17/2010 ORDERED that RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED and the response shall be filed NO LATER THAN AUGUST 26, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the PWM REMAINS HELD IN ABEYANCE pending the response. (GLOBKN) (kn)
08/26/2010RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to pet's writ of mandamus.
08/26/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
08/31/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION IS GRANTED and this appeal is HEREBY DISMISSED AS MOOT. (BY: ETW) lw
08/31/2010DISMISSED