Case: 11-99-00271-CR
11-99-00271-CR
09/16/1999
Theft
Laurie Dawn Buchanan
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
09/16/1999
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/25/2001 | Mandate issued | | |
02/28/2001 | Case returned from higher court | | |
01/31/2001 | Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case disposed | Refused | |
12/31/2000 | Yearly opinion book | | |
10/26/2000 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
10/03/2000 | Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case | | |
08/31/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/24/2000 | Submitted | | |
07/24/2000 | Submission set in Eastland | | |
05/10/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/10/2000 | Brief filed | | |
04/13/2000 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/10/2000 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
03/09/2000 | Brief filed | | |
03/09/2000 | Mot. - To file disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/02/2000 | Mot. - For leave/permission to file late article | | |
03/02/2000 | Brief received | | |
01/27/2000 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Writ or Motion Granted in Part | |
01/24/2000 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
01/19/2000 | Late brief inquiry | | |
12/07/1999 | Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed | | |
11/30/1999 | Late record inquiry | | |
10/14/1999 | Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed | | |
09/17/1999 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
09/16/1999 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
08/17/1999 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
08/13/1999 | Judgment of trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/25/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Laurie Buchanan | Criminal - Appellant | Lawrence B. Mitchell |
State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Bill Hill |
Trial Court Information
282nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Karen J. Greene, Judge
F97-76798-US
2 years