judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICKY GARNER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0760
Short Caption:RICKY GARNER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD25480-09Filed Date:06/17/2010

Opening Event Date:06/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/16/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/23/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/19/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRicky Garner Y
Abigail AskewYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Erik KenersonYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Abigail Askew, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/19/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Abigail Askew, Esquire
08/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (106pgs/Tape) 5/13/10 proc.
08/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/18/2010RECORD INDEX
08/18/2010RECORD COPIES
08/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Pretrial Services report filed 12/2/09)
08/18/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
08/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
10/05/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 45 days (no oppo)
10/13/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before November 19, 2010. (Castillo)
11/19/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 30 days
12/14/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 20, 2010. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
12/20/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (no oppo).
12/28/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 19, 2011. No further re quests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause.(ETW)
02/01/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 28, 2010, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before January 19, 2011, and it appearing that the brief and limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
02/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (no oppo)
03/10/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 24, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (By: ETW)
03/31/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 10, 2011, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before March 23, 2011, and it appearing that the brief and limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
04/29/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 31, 2011, which directed appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix, within 20 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (ETW)
06/03/2011ORDERED: That counsel for appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, or counsel shall show cause why she should not be held in contempt for failure to comply with this court's order. (By: ETW)
08/02/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - aplt's brief and appendix (Appellant)
08/24/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/24/2011FiledAppendix attached to Brief (Appellant)
08/24/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to file appellant's brief and limited appendix
09/16/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/16/2011FiledBrief w/ cd attached (Appellee)
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/23/2012FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judges Easterly, Pryor
02/23/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Easterly, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
03/19/2012FiledMandate